Waythrough

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Humankind Charity specialise in working with people with complex, multiple needs and are committed to multi disciplinary working, within our own teams and with external agencies. We work with disadvantaged people and communities. Our main areas of work focus on Accommodation & Housing Support, Substance misuse, Families and young people, education, training and employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£101,448,502
Donations and legacies | £82.74k | |
Charitable activities | £101.02m | |
Other trading activities | £45.85k | |
Investments | £296.30k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£100,912,723
Raising funds | £665.77k | |
Charitable activities | £100.25m | |
Other | £0 |
£15,264 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £93,958,793 from 322 government contract(s) and £6,512,639 from 184 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £665.77k | |
Charitable expenditure | £100.25m | |
Retained for future use | £535.78k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £665.77k | |
Charitable expenditure | £100.25m | |
Retained for future use | £551.04k |
People

1831 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
262 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 16 |
£70k to £80k | 5 |
£80k to £90k | 13 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 4 |
£120k to £130k | 3 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- D I S C LTD (Working name)
- DISC (Working name)
- DEVELOPING INITIATIVES FOR SUPPORT IN THE COMMUNITY LIMITED (Previous name)
- HUMANKIND CHARITY (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Homes England
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Gitsham | Chair | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kapil Bakshi | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Ian Edward Ayling | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Maureen Hopcroft | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Paul John Najsarek | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Susan Anne Moore | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Carolyn Regan | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Danielle Oum | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|||||
James Walder | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bhakti Seth | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Selina Douglas | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian MACQueen | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Boyt | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH SHEPHERD | Trustee | 21 August 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.19m | £65.11m | £70.85m | £80.53m | £101.45m | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.76m | £62.13m | £69.07m | £79.35m | £100.91m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £41.55m | £59.35m | £65.79m | £72.03m | £93.96m | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.19m | £2.99m | £4.09m | £8.23m | £6.51m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.15m | £77.92k | £123.82k | £65.11k | £82.74k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £34.74k | £56.09k | £19.18k | £147.41k | £45.85k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £44.90m | £64.97m | £70.70m | £80.19m | £101.02m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £20.77k | £863 | £470 | £124.19k | £296.30k | |
|
Income - Other | £85.75k | £7.85k | £10.35k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £45.36m | £61.88m | £68.72m | £78.88m | £100.25m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £234.99k | £251.35k | £353.74k | £471.89k | £665.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £20.50k | £150.12k | £1.10m | £1.52m | £1.65m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £69.41k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £161.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.33m | £8.52m | £9.54m | £10.34m | £14.14m | |
|
Long-term investments | £35.00k | £1 | £1 | £1.99m | £2.00m | |
|
Other assets | £13.47m | £17.51m | £21.57m | £25.40m | £27.66m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£110.00k | -£172.00k | -£129.00k | -£23.00k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £12.05m | £13.23m | £16.51m | £21.96m | £27.49m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MAY 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 23RD MAY 1988 AND 28TH NOVEMBER 1991 AND 24TH JUNE 1998 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 DEC 2022 as amended on 01 Jun 2024 as amended on 06 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
OBJECTS 3 The objects ("the Objects") for which the Charity is established are for general charitable purposes in order to provide support and assistance to individuals who may be socially excluded and seeking to improve their quality of life, to become fully integrated members of Society, in particular by: 3.1 providing assistance and support in the relief of physical and mental health problems of persons in need by reasons of substance use, abuse or dependency, including alcohol and drugs; 3.2 providing assistance and support in the prevention of harm by reasons of substance use, abuse or dependency including alcohol and drugs; 3.3 relieving the hardship of those in need by reasons of youth, age, infirmity, physical or mental disability, poverty or social and economic circumstances by the provision of social housing and housing support; 3.4 the relief of unemployment and advancement of education (including sustainable training for employment or work) for the benefit of the public generally and in particular such persons who are in need due to the lack of educational or skills attainment or who otherwise require assistance in gaining employment; 3.5 the relief of poverty, hardship (financial or otherwise) and distress among children, young people, families and other members of society in necessitous circumstances by providing and assisting in the provision of such facilities, advice and support as may be required to improve their conditions of life; and 3.6 assisting in the preservation and protection of health, and in the treatment and care of persons suffering from mental or physical health conditions or illnesses or in need of rehabilitation as a result of the same, through the provision of clinical and other services and support.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Waythrough
Unit 22
Bowburn North Industrial Estate
Bowburn
DURHAM
DH6 5PF
- Phone:
- 01325731160
- Email:
- info@humankindcharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window