FRIENDS OF DR ADLER'S SURGERY

Charity number: 1191581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To relieve sickness and to preserve the health of the patients of Dr JS Adler's Surgery (currently situate at 682 Finchley Road London NW11) by providing or assisting in the provision of premises, equipment, facilities and services not normally provided by the statutory authorities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £10,280
Total expenditure: £17,952

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 October 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW WARREN LEVISON Chair 01 June 2020
THE BSD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
PAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ATERES MOSHE
Received: On time
NORTH WEST LONDON COMMUNAL MIKVAH LIMITED
Received: On time
TORAH FAMILY SUPPORT NETWORK LTD
Received: On time
Jonathan Hager Trustee 01 June 2020
None on record
ARIEH LEIB LEVISON Trustee 01 June 2020
FRIENDS OF ORCHOS TORAH
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF YESHIVAS BRISK
Received: On time
BEIS BRUCHA LTD
Received: On time
TAHAROS BEIYUN
Received: On time
TORAH VODAAS LIMITED
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF KUPAT HAKAHAL KIRHYAT SEFER
Received: On time
PROJECT S E E D
Received: On time
PONEVEZ INSTITUTIONS BNEI-BRAQ ISRAEL
Received: On time
AREIVIM
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £58.80k £36.50k £10.28k
Total expenditure £41.01k £30.27k £17.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 25 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
73 THE RIDGEWAY
LONDON
NW11 8PH
Phone:
02084555999
Website:

No information available