IDEA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
iDEA Foundation helps people develop digital and enterprise skills, discover new talents and gain digital confidence, for free. iDEA learners work through modules online to be rewarded with digital badges and points which are collected, and count towards achieving the Bronze, Silver or Gold Inspiring Digital Enterprise Award.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 3 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 June 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Robert Anthony Cryan CBE FIET | Chair | 06 May 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Richard William James Parry | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Arjuna Gihan Fernando MBE | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £621.62k | £560.41k | £191.11k | £105.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £251.88k | £374.35k | £357.49k | £321.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £46 | £1.22k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £621.58k | £559.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £251.88k | £374.35k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.43k | £8.25k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, IN PARTICULAR IN THE SUBJECTS OF DIGITAL TECHNOLOGIES, ENTERPRISE AND ENTREPRENEURSHIP IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY PROVIDING ONLINE TOOLS TO DEVELOP SKILLS IN THESE AND RELATED SUBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 LINCOLN'S INN FIELDS
LONDON
WC2A 3LH
- Phone:
- 07392091597
- Email:
- support@idea.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window