THE BROMSGROVE YOUTH AND COMMUNITY HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth engagement through detached outreach, structured sessions, and schools work. Focus on mental health, sexual health, relationship building, mentoring & coaching.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £37,826 from 6 government contract(s) and £21,203 from 5 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 28 July 2020: CIO registration
- 21 August 2024: Funds received from 1149031 BROMSGROVE STREET PASTORS
- THE HUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Vincent | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirbyanne Reeves | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas May | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kristy Pascoe | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.14k | £108.47k | £223.94k | £209.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.03k | £77.55k | £132.16k | £198.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.80k | N/A | £54.70k | £37.83k | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.50k | £43.51k | £9.32k | £21.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 8 -19 LIVING IN BROMSGROVE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (1) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (2) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (3) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (4) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Market Street
Bromsgrove
Worcestershire
B61 8DA
- Phone:
- 01527873516
- Email:
- TheHubBromsgrove@outlook.com
- Website:
-
youthhubbromsgrove.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window