Financial history THE ST PETER AND ST PAUL SCHOOL TRUST

Charity Number: 516113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £996.81k £1.07m £1.25m £1.30m £1.32m
Total expenditure £968.63k £928.21k £1.05m £1.23m £1.35m
Income from government contracts £32.38k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.20k £3.87k £2.30k £320 £2.36k
Income - Other trading activities £109.92k £77.32k £76.92k £27.82k £70.16k
Income - Charitable activities £885.69k £989.37k £1.17m £103.23k £1.24m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £42.95k £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £968.63k £928.21k £1.05m £1.23m £1.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £23.77k £30.94k £36.21k £33.01k £41.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0