HEDNESFORD CENTENNIAL LIONS CLUB

Charity number: 1189734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising with raffles and tombolas to raise money to support the disabled and elderly community within the Hednesford area. Also to maintain the Hednesford war memorial and associated gardens and to improve it as a local garden amenity. Where possible we enhance the local environment with planting.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £1,979
Total expenditure: £3,118

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SHAUN MIDDLETON Chair 01 January 2020
BRIDGTOWN CONCERT SHOW BAND
Received: On time
Suzan Middleton Trustee 18 October 2022
None on record
Emma STACKHOUSE Trustee 12 April 2022
BRIDGTOWN CONCERT SHOW BAND
Received: On time
Jacqueline Trusler Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.04k £2.35k £2.51k £1.98k
Total expenditure £2.20k £3.08k £2.91k £3.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.74k N/A £500 £300

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 07 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 07 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 23 August 2024 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 23 August 2024 115 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 22 June 2023 53 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 07 May 2022 7 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
91 Corsican Drive
Hednesford
CANNOCK
Staffordshire
WS12 4SS
Phone:
07974209661
Website:

No information available