Accounts and annual returns LIONS CLUB OF HUDDERSFIELD (CIO)

Charity Number: 1190893
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 28 August 2024 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 27 August 2024 119 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 27 August 2024 485 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 27 August 2024 485 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 09 September 2022 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 09 September 2022 132 days late Download Open in new window