Accounts and annual returns TELFORD MIND

Charity Number: 516444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 May 2025 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 May 2025 457 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 May 2025 457 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2023 345 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2023 365 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2023 710 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2023 710 days late Download Open in new window