THE FRIENDS OF WHITE HALL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity fundraises and advocates for White Hall Outdoor Education Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Harrop-Griffiths | Chair | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Thornley | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eddie Liles | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Belton | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Wharmby | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Dan Riley | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Johnston | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dodgson | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Collier | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02k | £1.07k | £6.30k | £15.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.59k | £5.03k | £12.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN OUTDOOR EDUCATION CENTRE, FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITE HALL
MANCHESTER ROAD
BUXTON
DERBYSHIRE
SK17 6SX
SK17 6SX
- Phone:
- 0129823260
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window