THE COWRIE SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cowrie Scholarship Foundation has a clear mission to fund disadvantaged Black British students through leading UK universities in the next decade. The Foundation will partner with leading Universities, together with with businesses and donors to provide full scholarships to disadvantaged Black British students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Richard Oreffo | Chair | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tosha Nembhard | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ajay Ajisola Ajimobi | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sadiya Akram | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Chelsea Austin-Ajaero | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Dawson | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
DR TIM CLAYDEN | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|||||
PEER-JADA QURESHI | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.23k | £204.87k | £231.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.94k | £108.59k | £207.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY MAKING GRANTS AND AWARDS IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT NECESSARILY EXCLUSIVELY, TO SOCIO-ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED BRITISH STUDENTS, WITH AN ETHNICITY FROM AFRICAN, CARRIBEAN AND MIXED WITH ONE OF THESE ETHNICITIES, WISHING TO UNDERTAKE A COURSE OF HIGHER EDUCATION, WITH LEADING UNIVERSITIES OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, WHICH THEY WOULD OTHERWISE NOT BE ABLE TO UNDERTAKE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 School Road
West Wellow
ROMSEY
SO51 6AR
- Phone:
- 07833437591
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window