SOAR VALLEY OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, the prevention or relief of poverty in Leicestershire through the provision of a food bank, a money management/debt advice service, grants of financial assistance, signposting and to support individuals in financial need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £24,600 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 30 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy David Jackson | Chair | 30 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Kenneth Arkley | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Patricia Jackson | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM DUNN MBA | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.92k | £57.77k | £62.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.60k | £48.49k | £62.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.20k | £25.35k | £24.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN LEICESTERSHIRE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A FOODBANK, A MONEY MANAGEMENT/DEBT ADVICE SERVICE, GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SIGNPOSTING AND SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS IN FINANCIAL NEED.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Meadow Road
Mountsorrel
Loughborough
LE12 7HN
- Phone:
- 07743765958
- Email:
- soarvalleycma@gmail.com
- Website:
-
soarvalleycma.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window