THE HULL AND BARNSLEY RAILWAY STOCKFUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve and protect a representative collection of Hull & Barnsley Railway passenger and goods rolling stock for use by and education of the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bruce Robinson | Chair | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Gregory | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Grassam | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Crowther | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Cox | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allan Hallman | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER CUBITT | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|||||
David Cullingworth | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/11/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.16k | £8.12k | £8.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.26k | £12.00k | £7.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 November 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 November 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT A REPRESENTATIVE COLLECTION OF HULL & BARNSLEY RAILWAY (H&BR) PASSENGER AND GOODS ROLLING STOCK, FOR USE BY, AND FOR THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND TECHNIQUE OF RAILWAY COACHBUILDERS NOT ONLY ON THE NORTH YORKSHIRE MOORS RAILWAY AND ON OTHER HERITAGE RAILWAYS BY WORKING WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO REPRESENT AND ASSIST ITS MEMBERS, WHICH SHALL INCLUDE OTHER RAILWAY PRESERVATION ORGANISATIONS, WITH THE RESTORATION, CONSERVATION AND OPERATION OF THE AFOREMENTIONED RAILWAY VEHICLES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 CHEQUERFIELD COURT
PONTEFRACT
WF8 2TQ
- Phone:
- 01977793493
- Email:
- aledhal@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window