BLACK, ASIAN & MINORITY ETHNIC EDUCATORS (BAMEED)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a grassroots network aimed at ensuring our diverse communities are accepted as a substantive part of the education workforce. We seek to address the inequities in the recruitment and career progression of Black, Asian and minority ethnic colleagues into the teaching profession. We advocate, coach & connect educators and schools together towards achieving racial and other social justice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 December 2020: CIO registration
- BAMEED (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Domini Agboeze | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Vasco | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Akinde | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lilian Martin | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lizana Oberholzer | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Amjad Ali | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALLANA GAY | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.09k | £9.16k | £8.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.76k | £4.59k | £6.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2023 | 242 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF BAMEED (THE CIO) ARE TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE EDUCATION SECTOR (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST EDUCATION LEADERSHIP) BY:- - PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO EMPOWER BAME EDUCATORS; - PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; - PROMOTING ENGAGEMENT WITH NON BAME EDUCATORS TO CULTIVATE A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; - CONDUCTING OR SUPPORTING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES; - ASSISTING SCHOOLS IN ATTRACTING BAME EDUCATORS, LEADERS AND GOVERNORS; - ASSISTING SCHOOLS IN DIVERSIFYING THEIR CURRICULUM AND UNDERSTANDING THE EFFECTIVENESS OF DIVERSITY TAUGHT IN THE CURRICULUM; - SUPPORTING BAME EDUCATORS AS ROLE MODELS WITHIN THE SECTOR; - SUPPORTING BAME EDUCATORS SUCH THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN THE EDUCATION SECTOR; AND - LIAISING WITH ORGANISATIONS COMMITTED TO DEVELOPING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN EDUCATION. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 82A
James Carter Road
Mildenhall
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Suffolk
- Phone:
- 07763824053
- Email:
- BAMEed@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window