USHAW TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and protection of Ushaw Estate as a selfsustainable centre celebrating the history and heritage of the Ushaw historic house, offering opportunity for the public to access its chapels, its artefacts, its gardens and the wider estate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol LAWRENCE | Chair | 06 December 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
James Whiston | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION OF USHAW ESTATE AS A SELF SUSTAINABLE CENTRE CELEBRATING THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE USHAW HISTORIC HOUSE, OFFERING OPPORTUNITY FOR THE PUBLIC TO ACCESS ITS CHAPELS, ITS ARTEFACTS, ITS GARDENS AND THE WIDER ESTATE, ITS INTERNATIONALLY IMPORTANT LIBRARY, COLLECTIONS AND ARTEFACTS, AND TO ADVANCE THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE THROUGH PUBLIC DISPLAYS, EXHIBITIONS, INTERPRETATION AND EDUCATIONAL EVENTS, OUTREACH WORK, AND ACADEMIC RESEARCH. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
USHAW COLLEGE
DURHAM
DH7 9RH
- Phone:
- 01913738500
- Email:
- meet@ushaw.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window