Trinity St. Andrews Methodist and UR Church, Skipton

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trinity St Andrews has a mission to serve our community at all ages both in person and online through regular worship, prayer meetings, Messy Church and study groups; developing people's relationship with God and spreading the good news about Jesus; supporting through life's challenges by Pastoral Visitors and prayer support. We are proud of our community allotment, Warm Space and Wellbeing Cafe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 November 2020: Standard registration
- Trinity St. Andrews, Skipton (Working name)
- ST ANDREW'S (METHODIST AND UNITED REFORMED CHURCH),SKIPTON (Previous name)
- ST ANDREW'S CHURCH, SKIPTON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Susan McIvor | Chair | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN COOMBES | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Alistair Hey | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Hickman | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Lloyd | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Martin Christopher Bendall BSc Hons | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Rogers BA MEd | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rachel Coombes | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil John Platt | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.04k | £147.14k | £132.67k | £240.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.36k | £136.07k | £150.30k | £160.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 19 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAR 2018 as amended on 12 Feb 2023 as amended on 22 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES. IN ACHIEVING ITS PURPOSE, THE CHARITY WILL ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES, EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): A) THE CELEBRATION OF PUBLIC WORSHIP; B) THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; C) MISSION AND EVANGELISM; D) PASTORAL WORK, INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK AND THE BEREAVED; E) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE ELDERLY, THE YOUNG AND OTHER GROUPS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; AND F) THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trinity St Andrews Church
Westmoreland Street
SKIPTON
North Yorkshire
BD23 2EA
- Phone:
- 01756 691057
- Email:
- hello@tsaskipton.church
- Website:
-
tsaskipton.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window