VAUGHAN WILLIAMS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1193080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We make grants in furtherance of our charitable objects to individuals and organisations. The Trustees' current priorities are support for the work of professional composers of the last 100 years, and work which furthers the understanding of the life and music of Ralph Vaughan Williams and Ursula Vaughan Williams. Applications must be made at www.vaughanwilliamsfoundation.org/funding

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Ireland
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 January 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sally Hilary Groves MBE Chair 14 January 2021
None on record
Andrew HUNTER JOHNSTON Trustee 14 January 2021
None on record
Professor Richard Causton Trustee 14 January 2021
None on record
BERNARD ANTHONY WATSON Trustee 14 January 2021
THE VAUGHAN WILLIAMS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROYAL AIR FORCE CLUB
Received: On time
PROFESSOR NICOLA LEFANU Trustee 14 January 2021
THE RVW TRUST
Received: On time
THE AMBACHE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
HELEN FAULKNER Trustee 14 January 2021
THE RVW TRUST
Received: On time
THE GERALD COKE HANDEL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Nicolas John Bell Trustee 14 January 2021
THE VAUGHAN WILLIAMS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE HARLEIAN SOCIETY INCORPORATED 1902
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BENEDICTS, CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
Hugh Michael Thomas Cobbe Trustee 14 January 2021
NEWBURY AND DISTRICT ORGANISTS' ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
John Temperley Axon Trustee 14 January 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £45 £723.56k
Total expenditure £0 £485 £628.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £78.85k
Income - Other N/A N/A £644.72k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £488.18k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £140.39k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £21.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £270.72k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £17.23k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A £596.01k
Long-term investments N/A N/A £7.25m
Other assets N/A N/A £398.07k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A £326.30k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
13 Calico Row
LONDON
SW11 3YH
Phone:
02072233385