SALTBURN SOLIDARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Saltburn Solidarity provides food parcels to people in need, in and around Saltburn-by-the-Sea, North Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 27 October 2020: CIO registration
- SALTBURN SOLIDARITY FOODBANK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynn Jefferson-Prescott | Chair | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Neal | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Eileen Elizabeth Tilley | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Humphrey | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.18k | £33.53k | £52.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.87k | £27.67k | £33.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.06k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN SALTBURN-BY-THE-SEA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THAT ARE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN SUCH WAYS THAT THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO PARTICULAR FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES.” NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Area of benefit
IN SALTBURN-BY-THE-SEA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Windsor Road
SALTBURN-BY-THE-SEA
Cleveland
TS12 1BH
- Phone:
- 07496018384
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window