LEICESTER AREA QUAKER MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer public meetings for silent worship after the manner of the Society of Friends (Quakers). We uphold our members and attenders in a caring community where pastoral and spiritual care is taken very seriously, at the same time as reaching out to a wider public. We work with other churches and faiths and to promote our testimonies to simplicity, justice, peace, equality and the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 11 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jane Bolter | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Margaret Dnes | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Frank Walker | Trustee | 08 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Margery Anne Fishenden | Trustee | 08 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Matthews | Trustee | 08 March 2020 |
|
|||||
James Stuart Deane | Trustee | 13 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.35k | £93.31k | £109.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.17k | £76.99k | £140.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF LEICESTER AREA QUAKER MEETING IS THE FURTHERANCE OF THE GENERAL RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN IN THE AREA OF LEICESTER AREA QUAKER MEETING AND BEYOND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUAKER MEETING HOUSE
16 QUEENS ROAD
LEICESTER
LE2 1WP
- Phone:
- 01162705003
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window