PARISH OF WYKE REGIS, ALL SAINTS WITH ST EDMUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hold church services at the two churches within the parish, details of which are posted outside the churches
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £350 from 1 government grant(s)
People

20 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 16 February 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Hall | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||
MARK STONE | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Jane Margaret Thomas | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Diana Mary Gill | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Joan Kathleen Robb | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Lynda Ferry | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Amy Roff | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Robert William Smith | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Marilyn Anne Mackenzie | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Lorraine Elizabeth Ovenden | Trustee | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Maxine Elisabeth Foster | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Julie Lorraine Norris | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Derek Rodney Griffin | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Leslie Donald Seamark | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Jeffrey Thomas | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Michael John DILLISTONE | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Maxine Angela LEGG | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Cheryl Loretta Mary WISE | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Caroline Elizabeth Elliott | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Gary Richard Hepburn | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.58k | £106.78k | £183.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.78k | £90.66k | £104.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £700 | £350 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Portland Road
Weymouth
DT4 9ES
- Phone:
- 01305784649
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window