FRIENDS OF CEREDIGION YOUNG MUSICIANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and advance the musical education of children and young persons under the age of 25 from within the area of Ceredigion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 06 May 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nia Perris | Chair | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
geraint Evans | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rebecca Wood | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Helen Elizabeth Gethin | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Rhian Dafydd | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Nicholas Shilton | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr Owen Gruffudd Roberts | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Hilary Louise McConnell | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
MR W GWYN JONES | Trustee | 14 May 1996 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.48k | £13.65k | £1.35k | £2.06k | £8.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.27k | £8.60k | £2.30k | £8.79k | £3.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAY 1981 AS AMENDED 25 JANUARY 1986 AS FURTHER AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 8 MARCH 1999, AMENDED 14 FEBRUARY 2000 null as amended on 28 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS AGED 25 YEARS AND UNDER WHO ARE EITHER PUPILS ATTENDING THE SCHOOLS ADMINISTERED BY CYNGOR SIR CEREDIGION COUNTY COUNCIL (THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) OR STUDENTS FORMERLY FROM CEREDIGION SCHOOLS PURSUING MUSIC COURSES AT SPECIALIST MUSIC SCHOOLS OR FURTHER EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AMENITIES OR ASSISTANCE NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED OR ADEQUATELY PROVIDED BY THE LEA.
Area of benefit
CEREDIGION
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Coed y Bryn
Panteg
Aberaeron
Ceredigion
SA46 0DW
- Phone:
- 07510227814
- Email:
- wgwynj@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window