ASIAN FAMILY COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides marital, family and individual counselling to the Asian community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £41,125 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 May 1986: Standard registration
- AFCS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fawzia Samad | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
RASHIDA PUNJA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NINA TOLLER JP | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.83k | £190.96k | £168.16k | £185.19k | £76.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.78k | £157.13k | £140.14k | £133.50k | £161.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £74.48k | £147.52k | £147.57k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.25k | £18.25k | £18.25k | £175.71k | £41.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 APRIL 1986,AS AMENDED 15 NOVEMBER 1990 AND 12 JULY 1991
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONG PERSONS OF ASIAN ORIGIN AND PARTICULARLY AMONG SUCH PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF MARRIAGE AND FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS WITH A VIEW TO DEVELOPING PERSONAL RESPONSIBILITIES AND ENRICHING FAMILY LIFE AND (II) TO SAFEGAURD AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN OF ASIAN ORIGIN AND PARTICULARLY OF SUCH PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND TO PREVENT HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF MARRIAGE AND FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
F1
Unit 4
Triangle Centre
399
Uxbridge Road
- Phone:
- 07710545552
- Email:
- admin@asianfamily.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window