Trustees THE BREATHE WELL INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1194481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Afua Tobigah Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
James Edward Fofana Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
Kseniia Bielosludtseva Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
Georgina Forbes Trustee 05 October 2023
CAMBOURNE CHURCH
Received: On time
Dr Dr Steven Kaindaneh Trustee 11 September 2022
None on record
Adama Fofana Trustee 17 June 2022
None on record