ANGLO-ISRAEL ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education relating to the archaeology of Israel and its neighbours by facilitating the exchange of lecturers, researchers and students in the archaeology of the region and kindred subjects, assisting with the development of the archaeology of Israel and its neighbours, establishing scholarships and the awarding of grants, publishing and distributing journals and other literature
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 21 September 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor SARAH PEARCE | Chair | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sandra Jacobs | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Arjen Feike Bakker | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Thomas Collins | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr RACHAEL SPARKS | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID FRIEDMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MARTIN GOODMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr ANTHONY RABIN | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Professor Tessa Rajak | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Professor Hugh Williamson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr MARK MERRONY | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr REBEKAH WELTON | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.60k | £155.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.20k | £35.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ("THE OBJECTS") ARE AS FOLLOWS; TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF CURRENT AND EARLIER WORK RELATING TO THE ARCHAEOLOGY OF LSRAEL AND ITS NEIGHBOURS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY FACILITATING THE EXCHANGE OF LECTURERS , RESEARCHERS AND STUDENTS IN THE ARCHAEOLOGY OF THE REGION AND KINDRED SUBJECTS , ASSISTING WITH THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE ARCHAEOLOGY OF LSRAEL AND ITS NEIGHBOURS, ESTABLISHING SCHOLARSHIPS AND THE AWARDING OF GRANTS PUBLISHING AND DISTRIBUTING JOURNALS AND OTHER LITERATURE AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE LNVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN LRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4th Floor
Silverstream House
45 Fitzroy Street
Fitzrovia
London
- Phone:
- 020 3840 3660
- Email:
- secretary@aias.org.uk
- Website:
-
aias.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window