Trustees Rhondda Ministry Area

Charity number: 1195437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicola Jayne Free Chair 01 January 2022
None on record
Rev James Lawson Trustee 25 June 2023
ORCHARD VALE TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Margaret Elizabeth Bowen Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Rev Sarah Rogers Trustee 16 February 2023
None on record
Jacqueline Llewellyn Trustee 27 February 2022
None on record
MARGARET EVANS Trustee 27 February 2022
None on record
Mari Harrison Trustee 27 February 2022
None on record
William John Richards Trustee 27 February 2022
PENDYRUS MALE CHOIR
Received: On time
Margaret Raye Saunders Trustee 01 January 2022
LLANDAFF DIOCESAN MOTHERS UNION
Received: On time
Michael Andrew Trustee 01 January 2022
GUILD OF SERVANTS OF THE SANCTUARY
Received: On time
CANDIDATES FOR ORDINATION FUND OF THE GUILD OF SERVANTS OF THE SANCTUARY
Received: On time
HOWARD GADD TRUST
Received: On time
Rowena May Harding Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Rev David Mark Jones Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Rev Peter Simon Gale Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Richard Charles Nicholas Coombs Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Kathryn Phelps Goodman Trustee 09 August 2021
None on record
Kevin Staveley BEM Trustee 09 August 2021
None on record