Financial history MARSKE AND NEW MARSKE DISTRICT GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 517865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £12.84k £4.28k £9.17k £3.02k £1.13k
Total expenditure £5.58k £13.87k £11.18k £3.16k £2.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A