SOMERSET CRICKET FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE HERE TO FACILITATE THE PLAYING AND IMPROVEMENT OF RECREATIONAL CRICKET IN SOMERSET AS WELL AS POSITIVELY IMPACTING OUR COMMUNITIES THROUGH CRICKET.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income:
£1,097,049
Donations and legacies | £84.34k | |
Charitable activities | £958.01k | |
Other trading activities | £51.35k | |
Investments | £3.35k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,048,856
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.05m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.05m | |
Retained for future use | £48.19k |
People

40 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- Somerset
Governance
- 06 May 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER WINSTON GORDON DUGUID | Chair | 16 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Rawlings | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Gibson | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Habib Naqvi | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Rowson | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Roger Leslie Eggleton | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Maurice Magill | Trustee | 16 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £743.27k | £1.10m | |
|
Total expenditure | £596.71k | £1.05m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £580.10k | £84.34k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £9.97k | £51.35k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £153.10k | £958.01k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £3.35k | |
|
Income - Other | £107 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £74.60k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £486.61k | £1.05m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £110.10k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.28k | £32.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2022 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £13.08k | £14.85k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £460.52k | £573.53k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £99.04k | £98.43k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 SEP 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 FEB 2021 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 MAR 2021 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, PARTICULARLY THE INHABITANTS OF SOMERSET AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS: (A) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF AND DEVELOPMENT OF CRICKET AND OTHER SPORTS THAT ARE CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH (‘FACILITIES’ IN THIS ARTICLE 1 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES INCLUDING COACHING AND INSTRUCTION); (B) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE GAME OF CRICKET AND OTHER GAMES OR SPORT, ON A RECREATIONAL BASIS FOR THE LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; AND (D) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Centre of Excellence
THE COUNTY GROUND
ST. JAMES STREET
TAUNTON
TA1 1JT
- Phone:
- 01823352266
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window