MARCUS GARVEY DAY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide day care facilities to African/Caribbean Elders and people of other communities in the city of Nottingham. To provide support to those elders who have dementia to improve the quality of their life and promote self worth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 22 October 1986: Standard registration
- MARCUS GARVEY DAY CENTRE/LUNCHEON CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TARZE SMALL | Trustee | 21 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
TONY PALMER | Trustee | 21 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
SHARON RILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Tyron Browne | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
ROY TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
LYNN SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £360 | £168 | £0 | £11.78k | £9.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.35k | £36.53k | £0 | £11.83k | £4.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.02k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 July 2024 | 258 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED SEPTEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED 9TH NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE RADFORD AND LENTON AREAS OF NOTTINGHAM AND ELSEWHERE PARTICULARLY THOSE OF AFRO-CARIBBEAN ORIGIN IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOTINGHAM AND NOTINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARCUS GARVEY DAY CENTRE & ALZHEIMERS GROUP
LENTON BOULEVARD
NOTTINGHAM
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
NG7 2BY
- Phone:
- 01159792906
- Email:
- ROYTAYLOR7537@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window