EVERYONE'S INVITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The problem that Everyone's Invited seeks to address is rape culture. Rape culture includes misogyny, rape jokes, sexual harassment (groping, non-consensual touching), image-based abuse (upskirting, non-consensual sharing of intimate photos, cyber flashing), and sexual coercion. We provide an anonymous sharing platform for survivors as well as engage in delivering education in schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 October 2021: CIO registration
- 01 October 2024: Funds received from 1198695 YOUNG ABUSE SUPPORT (YAS)
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Sara | Chair | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Coombs | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Kane | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bella Deborah Mary Bird | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Atalia Silas | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan le Jeune d'Allegeershecque CMG | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sigal Shalev | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.45k | £297.14k | £242.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.22k | £134.12k | £250.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF EVERYONE'S INVITED ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF GENDER, BY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): A. RAISING AWARENESS OF ALL ASPECTS OF DISCRIMINATION IN SOCIETY BY PUBLICATIONS, LECTURES, USE OF THE MEDIA, PUBLIC ADVOCACY AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION; B. CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND PUBLICISING THE RESULTS OF THE SAME TO THE PUBLIC; C. ADVANCING EDUCATION IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WHETHER BY TEACHING OR PRODUCING MATERIALS; AND D. PROVIDING OR FACILITATING THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUALS OR ORGANISATIONS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THROUGH GRANT-MAKING, TRAINING, COUNSELLING, ADVICE OR GUIDANCE IN RELATION TO CHALLENGING OR ELIMINATING GENDER DISCRIMINATION, PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND SUPPORTING PEOPLE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED SEXUAL VIOLENCE AND/OR HARASSMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
STREATHERS SOLICITORS
ACCURIST HOUSE
44 BAKER STREET
W1U 7AL
- Phone:
- 020 7431 8889
- Email:
- welcome@everyonesinvited.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window