Accounts and annual returns RUGBY ANIMAL TRUST

Charity number: 518314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 December 2024 320 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 December 2024 682 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 May 2022 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 May 2022 471 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 May 2022 471 days late Download Open in new window