MOSAIC RWANDA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mosaic Rwanda promotes inclusive communities in Rwanda. We advocate the value, potential and involvement of all people in society, particularly those facing challenges related to mental health, special educational needs and physical disability. We do this through the provision of funding for local people and organisations in Rwanda who are making a difference in their community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
- Oxfordshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 22 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Christopher Overton May | Chair | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Laurence Hills | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bethune Lillieth Brown-Reid | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Noel Mulindabigwi | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 147 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN RWANDA BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS, LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND PHYSICAL DISABILITIES. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN RWANDA BY THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF MENTAL HEALTH, SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS, LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND PHYSICAL DISABILITIES. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN RWANDA BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY IN RWANDA. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN RWANDA BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING, OR PAYING FOR, ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Corneville Road
Drayton
ABINGDON
Oxfordshire
OX14 4HN
- Phone:
- 07981787340
- Email:
- info@mosaicrwanda.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window