Financial history CASTELL NEWYDD EMLYN A'R CYLCH EISTEDDFOD COMMITTEE

Charity Number: 518635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £0 £1 £4 £4.94k £5.38k
Total expenditure £0 £20 £40 £5.61k £5.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A