Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WOODHOUSE AND WRANGTHORN
Charity number: 1196073

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Eve Rebecca Ridgeway | Trustee | 04 May 2025 |
|
|||||
John Birkett | Trustee | 04 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Rev Joshua Lees | Trustee | 04 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Graham Hartney | Trustee | 04 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Hodson | Trustee | 04 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Seabourne | Trustee | 04 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Elizabeth Louise Woolf | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Toby Grasham | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jasmine Barber | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kristan Celia Webb | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Cowderoy | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Johnson | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.