SUSSEX SYRIAN COMMUNITY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sussex Syrian Community Group aims to empower Syrian refugees in Sussex to build integrated, stable and happy lives in the UK. We create spaces for Syrians to come together, often with others from the wider community in Brighton and Hove, to celebrate our history, culture and resilience. We run language courses, skills courses, and provide advice and help with accessing services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 06 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ahmad Yabroudi | Chair | 12 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Mohamad Khaled Morad | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fathi Khalil | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Massara | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esam Albdin | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jamal Alsakka | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.75k | £18.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.51k | £15.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.00k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN SUSSEX WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED (IN PARTICULAR, MEMBERS OF THE SYRIAN COMMUNITY) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING: (A) EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND IN OTHER SKILLS AND SUBJECTS; (B) A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF THE SYRIAN COMMUNITY TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; (C) SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. (2) THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN THE SYRIAN COMMUNITY AND ALL OTHER RACIAL GROUPS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT THE SYRIAN COMMUNITY TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (C) RAISING AWARENESS OF SYRIAN CULTURE BY RUNNING CLASSES, HOLDING EVENTS AND SHARING INFORMATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARY MAGDALENS COMMUNITY CENTRE
55 UPPER NORTH STREET
BRIGHTON
BN1 3FH
- Phone:
- 07460963163
- Website:
-
sussexsyriancommunity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window