BATLEY GIRLS (RAE, TAYLOR, HIRST AND TALBOT) SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity number: 519010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

AWARDING TO GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER BOROUGH OF BATLEY, SCHOLARSHIPS OR GRANTS FOR THEIR FURTHER EDUCATION TENABLE TO ANY COLLEGE OR UNIVERSITY

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £2,707
Total expenditure: £1,870

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Kirklees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 July 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Patricia Ann Waite-Wright Chair 11 May 2017
None on record
Marion Kemp Trustee 18 September 2024
None on record
Jenny Fox Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
JACK LEESON Trustee
None on record
Paul Duncan Taylor Trustee
BATLEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL (RAE AND TAYLOR) SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
BATLEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days
CHARITY OF DAME ELEANOR ASHETON
Received: On time
BATLEY AND BIRSTALL COMMUNITY FUND CIO
Received: On time
Gwen Lowe Trustee
Batley Community Centre
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.31k £2.40k £2.54k £2.63k £2.71k
Total expenditure £587 £2.58k £2.60k £3.70k £1.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
175 Raikes Lane
Birstall
BATLEY
WF17 9QH
Phone:
01924476206
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available