MAXIMUS FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Maximus Foundation is committed to helping people in need. The focus is to support charities that help disadvantaged people and make a real difference to people's lives; through health, employment or community development. The Maximus Foundation supports charities by providing them with meaningful grants, which enables the organisation's to drive forward their core mission and purpose.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 March 2022: CIO registration
- 01 August 2024: Funds received from 1160326 MAXIMUS FOUNDATION UK
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charis Green | Chair | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Ferdinand Morales Jr | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Roger Kenneth Peace | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Patrick McGeough | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Lynne Sheehy | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Tracie Wilson | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 August 2023 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Mar 2022 as amended on 29 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: - THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF THOSE IN NEED IN ANY PART OF THE UK BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND - THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MAKING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maximus UK
Suite B, First Floor
2 Navigation Walk
Waterfront
Wakefield
WF1 5RH
- Phone:
- 07350356606
- Email:
- foundation@maximusuk.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window