FRIENDS OF DEDDINGTON CHURCH

Charity number: 1197482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The CIO assists in the preservation and protection of the ancient building of the Parish Church of St Peter and St Paul in the Diocese of Oxford through raising funds for the maintenance and improvement of the building and its grounds.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,841
Total expenditure: £27,792

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lord Andrew Green KCMG Chair 13 January 2022
None on record
Caroline Ann Condon Trustee 07 July 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SS PETER & PAUL DEDDINGTON WITH CLIFTON AND HEMPTON
Received: On time
Colin Overend Hamilton Lambert Trustee 22 February 2022
THE DEDDINGTON CHARITY ESTATES
Received: On time
Jill Cheeseman Trustee 22 February 2022
DEDDINGTON HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Professor Lesley Milroy Trustee 13 January 2022
None on record
Catherine Desmond Trustee 13 January 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £46.82k £5.84k
Total expenditure £0 £27.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WESTON HOUSE
CHURCH STREET
DEDDINGTON
BANBURY
OX15 0TG
Phone:
01869337837
Website:

No information available