BE WITH ME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHARITABLE PROJECTS FOR NEEDY PEOPLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
Governance
- 11 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AHMED MASOUD SAID | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
NAJWAH KASSIM MASOUD | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
SOFIA ABDILLAHI OMAR | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED ASHRAFF ANSARY | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALI NASSOR ALI | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|||||
MARYAM NASSOR ALI | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.09k | £57.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.78k | £33.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jan 2022 as amended on 01 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG POOR PEOPLE, ORPHANS, WIDOWS, AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLEAN WATER, SHELTER, CLOTHING AND LIVELIHOOD PROGRAMMES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (2) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND ISLAMIC EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAN AND THE TEACHINGS OF PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PBUH); (3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS A SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 McAllister Grove
Barking
IG11 0FS
- Phone:
- 07947597264
- Email:
- contact@bewithme.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window