Trustees THE EVELYN GLENNIE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1201502

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gethyn Williams | Chair | 21 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Debalok Biswas | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Isabell Henderson | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Peter Smith | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Stephen Boylan Drew | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Terence John Makewell | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon David Wheeler | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beti Margaret Jo Richardson | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Caroline Thompson | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Georgina Hughes | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dame Evelyn Elizabeth Ann Glennie | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.