Financial history BLYTH STAR ENTERPRISES LIMITED

Charity number: 519443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.88m £2.09m £2.16m £2.47m £2.38m
Total expenditure £1.80m £1.72m £1.80m £1.90m £2.24m
Income from government contracts £1.60m £1.58m £1.72m £1.82m £1.98m
Income from government grants £10.50k £26.35k £10.38k £3.13k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £126.88k £345.90k £268.29k £447.52k £101.97k
Income - Other trading activities £53.33k £42.02k £59.23k £63.65k £63.22k
Income - Charitable activities £1.70m £1.69m £1.83m £1.96m £2.21m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £748 £343 £61 £1.25k £6.70k
Income - Other £1.77k £8.01k £976 £2.01k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.78m £1.71m £1.78m £1.88m £2.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £15.49k £13.69k £18.47k £25.44k £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.00k £6.05k £6.30k £6.56k £10.64k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £40.98k