ST BERNARD'S - LARCHES & SAVICK COMMUNITY HUB(CIO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Hub.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £35,516 from 7 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID STANLEY BORROW | Chair | 30 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Nweeda Khan | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Philip Hubert Matthew Crowe | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Anne Christine Murray | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Christine Cox | Trustee | 18 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Jennifer Mein | Trustee | 16 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Emma Caffery | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £631 | £42.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73 | £18.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £35.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 196 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF LARCHES, LEA & SAVICK AND OTHER SURROUNDING AREAS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elswick Road
Larches
Ashton-on-Ribble
Preston
PR2 1NT
- Phone:
- 01772 372040
- Email:
- stbernardshub@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window