MARLBOROUGH AREA YOUTH FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Forum offers support, activities, events and fund raising opportunities for young people, aged 10 to 18 (or 25 with special educational needs), in the Marlborough Community Area to have fun and build their skills, capacities and capabilities to better enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 12 July 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Susan Thomas | Chair | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Rebbeck | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Ann Farrell | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn John Hall | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2023 | 01/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.15k | £22.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.79k | £13.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 16 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | 16 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE IN LIFE YOUNG PEOPLE, AGED 10 TO 18 (OR 25 WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS) IN MARLBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NOWELL HOUSE
KINGSBURY STREET
MARLBOROUGH
SN8 1HZ
- Phone:
- 07525934626
- Email:
- thomascs@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window