CAISTER COMMUNITY LARDER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of need through the provision of emergency supplies of food, clothing and other essentials. Support is given through the distribution of parcels of supplies in response to referrals for individuals in urgent need. A community larder is also offered, allowing beneficiaries to select good for themselves from the stock held by the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 28 July 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND DAVID WELLS | Chair | 28 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Stuart Paul Hellingsworth | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Wood | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL GEORGE DOYLE | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.78k | £22.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.51k | £18.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 October 2024 | 212 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN CAISTER-ON-SEA AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING AND OTHER ESSENTIALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rectory
Rectory Close
Caister-on-Sea
GREAT YARMOUTH
NR30 5EG
- Phone:
- 01493728431
- Email:
- cclarder@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window