TEMPLE CHURCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Within the City of London, the charity works to promote the Christian religion by holding religious services, the provision of religious instruction, pastoral care and ministry; talks and lectures about the church and the relationship between law and religion; it advances the architectural heritage of the Church by supporting its preservation and maintenance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
Governance
- 14 November 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Eileen Callaghan KC | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Rowe | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sally Smith KC | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
John David Clifford | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Evanna Fruithof | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fergus Mark Harry Randolph KC | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Hutton | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rory Andrew Livingstone Phillips KC | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Duncan McLaren KC | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 JUN 2022 as amended on 07 Dec 2023 as amended on 20 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION): (A) THE HOLDING OF RELIGIOUS SERVICES AND CELEBRATIONS; (B) THE PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION; AND (C) THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE AND MINISTRY; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) ITS KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF: (A) THE HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE TEMPLE CHURCH AND THE INNS; (B) THE RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN LAW AND RELIGION; AND (C) CHURCH AND OTHER MUSIC; TO ADVANCE THE ARCHITECTURAL HERITAGE OF THE TEMPLE CHURCH BY SUPPORTING ITS PRESERVATION MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Treasury Office
Inner Temple
London
United Kingdom
EC4Y 7HL
- Phone:
- 020 7353 8559
- Email:
- catherine@templechurch.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window