WESLEY PLACE METHODIST CHURCH ALSAGER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a Methodist Church we offer public worship, and community activities for people of all ages with both religious and non-religious content. Community facilities are available for hire locally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 16 September 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ROBERT OSMOND HILTON | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Natasha Jane Walker | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Laura Rawlinson | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Fawley Moors | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JANE STEELE | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Brislen | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|||||
MARGARET KEELING | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gwynneth Proudlove | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Mark Keen | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Elizabeth Peake | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Valerie Snowden | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Anne Milner | Trustee | 10 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Rose Weatherby Crompton | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Simpson | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Dale Shaw | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Robertson | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Emily Weatherby Crompton | Trustee | 01 September 2008 |
|
|
||||
Celia Mary Crompton | Trustee | 01 September 1996 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL CROMPTON | Trustee | 21 June 1973 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932 AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 26 OCT 1976
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESLEY PLACE METHODIST CHURCH
LAWTON ROAD
ALSAGER
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST7 2AF
- Phone:
- 01270872597
- Email:
- super@cheshiresouth.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window