Trustees THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF THE HOLY TRINITY AND OF SAINT PETER AND SAINT PAUL AND OF SAINT SWITHUN OF WINCHESTER

Charity number: 1202915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Canon Roland Gerardus Anthony Riem Chair 01 July 2005
THE MURRAY BEQUEST
Received: On time
HAMPSHIRE AND THE ISLANDS HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
THE PILGRIMS' SCHOOL
Received: On time
Rev Canon Andrew Mark Micklefield Trustee 05 April 2025
None on record
Christopher Roles Trustee 03 September 2023
None on record
Sarah Peppiatt Trustee 24 August 2023
FOOTPRINTS PROJECT LIMITED
Received: On time
The Revd Canon Professor Elizabeth Bridget Stuart Trustee 23 March 2023
SARUM COLLEGE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW, WINCHESTER
Received: On time
ALAN LOVELL Trustee 17 July 2022
None on record
Rev Theresa Helena Nancy Kuin Lawton Trustee 20 November 2021
THE PRAYER BOOK SOCIETY
Received: On time
Rev ANDREW PETER CHRISTOPHER TRENIER Trustee 15 September 2019
THE PILGRIMS' SCHOOL
Received: On time