THE GREAT OUSE RIVERS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Great Ouse Rivers Trust works for the protection and enhancement of the River Great Ouse and its catchment. The Trust does this through activities that support conservation, protection and enhancement of the river and its catchment and through the advancement of public education, engagement and awareness raising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Cambridgeshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Norfolk
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 24 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Rothwell | Chair | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kat Gillbe | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Leinster | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Rodden | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lara Hawkins | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Wightman | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Genevieve Madgwick | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Howard Osborne | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Boothman | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £480 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
(1) TO CONSERVE, PROTECT, AND IMPROVE THE RIVERS, STREAMS, WATERCOURSES AND WATER IMPOUNDMENTS OF THE CATCHMENTS COMPRISING THE RIVER GREAT OUSE FROM SOURCE TO SEA INCLUDING ADJACENT ESTUARINE AND COASTAL AREAS, FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, OR ANY ASSOCIATION, INSTITUTION, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION, LOCAL AUTHORITY, ADMINISTRATIVE OR GOVERNMENTAL AGENCY OR PUBLIC BODY OR REPRESENTATIVE BODY IN: - (A) THE UNDERSTANDING OF RIVERS, RIVER CORRIDORS AND RIVER CATCHMENTS, INCLUDING THEIR FAUNA, FLORA, BIODIVERSITY, ECONOMIC OR SOCIAL ACTIVITY, AND RIVER CATCHMENT MANAGEMENT. (B) THE NEED FOR, AND BENEFITS OF, CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF AQUATIC ENVIRONMENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GORT c/oHoughton & Wyton Parish Council
St Mary's Centre
Chapel Lane
HOUGHTON
HUNTINGDON
- Phone:
- 01480466588
- Email:
- HELENBOOTHMAN@BTINTERNET.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window