THE ISAAC NEWTON TRUST

Charity number: 1209261
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Isaac Newton Trust was established as a Trust in 1988 by Trinity College. The Trust promotes learning, research and education in the University of Cambridge, primarily by providing support to early career researchers and by making research grants to departments and programmes within the University and its constituent Colleges.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 July 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Francis - Frank Kelly Chair 01 May 2017
None on record
Professor Nicholas Thomas Trustee 05 April 2024
None on record
PROFESSOR JOHN PYLE FRS Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Professor Ben Simons Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
Professor Ashit - Ash Amin Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Professor Dame Ann Dowling Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Loraine Gelsthorpe Trustee 28 November 2019
PEMBROKE COLLEGE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
PROBATION INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Professor John Marenbon FBA Trustee 04 May 2019
None on record
DR RAE LANGTON Trustee 02 July 2018
None on record
Professor Sir David Baulcombe FRS Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
Professor Dame Jean Thomas Trustee 01 May 2017
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
105 EDDINGTON PLACE
Cambridge
CB3 1AS
Phone:
01223339933