Trustees SHROPSHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1200018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Judith Helene Lancaster Trustee 29 October 2024
None on record
Amanda Thorn MBE DL Trustee 26 March 2024
PRESTFELDE SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: 75 days late
ROGER Brentnall PEMBERTON Trustee 10 November 2023
SHROPSHIRE MASONIC CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
SHROPSHIRE RURAL SUPPORT
Received: On time
Ruth Martin Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Dr Graham Robert Wynn OBE Trustee 17 September 2023
ALBRIGHTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
SHROPSHIRE ARMY CADET FORCE TRUST
Recently registered
THE HON MRS SELINA LUCY GRAHAM Trustee 10 August 2022
SLANEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
WILLEY AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
WESTON PARK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
The Cavalier Centre Ltd
Received: On time
Amanda Nadine Harris Trustee 10 August 2022
4 ALL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Sonia Heather Roberts Trustee 10 August 2022
None on record
Benjamin David Powell Trustee 10 August 2022
None on record