Trustees NORTH DARTMOOR SEARCH AND RESCUE TEAM
Charity number: 1200541

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof James Paul Watts | Chair | 19 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
Trevor Bishop | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew David Collyer | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Joseph Bradley | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Applebee | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
David John Canavan | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
Megan Louise Keltie Hansen | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
David John Squires Goodwin-Hughes | Trustee | 09 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
HARRY GEORGE PRICE | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Catherine Ruth Davis | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
IAN PERRIOR | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.