THE DOGGETT FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the musical education of young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Jeremy Doggett | Chair | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Daniel BIshop | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Miranda Emily Doggett | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
William James Nicholas Doggett | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Freya Emily Doggett | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Matthew Thomas Doggett | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 IN THE ART OF MUSIC; 3.1.2 TO ADVANCE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD VICARAGE
SOMERTON ROAD
NORTH ASTON
BICESTER
OX25 6HX
- Phone:
- 01869340625
- Email:
- nigeldoggett@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window